Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Angel, Barron, Hayes, Hill, Morales, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain hearing officer from ordering the release of an individual who meets the requirements for involuntary admission under a certain provision of law on the grounds that the individual was kept at an emergency facility for more than 30 hours.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0947
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {686486/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Requirements and Procedures
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {686486/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Text - Chapter - Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page