Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation for Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Young, Mathias, and Eckardt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to ensure that the driver's license or identification card of an applicant who presents certain proof includes a notation indicating that the applicant is the surviving spouse of a veteran; requiring an application for a driver's license or an identification card to allow an applicant to indicate that the applicant is the surviving spouse of a veteran and consents to being contacted by certain Executive Branch agencies under certain circumstances for certain purposes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2017
Legislative Date
9/17/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {168373/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2017 9/17/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation for Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {168373/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation for Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   12-302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page