Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Pinsky, Nathan-Pulliam, Bailey, Carozza, Ellis, Gallion, Kagan, Lam, Patterson, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "nonprofit training entity" for the purposes of the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program to include an entity that uses trained therapy horses for interaction with veterans; altering the definition of "eligible veteran" to include veterans who receive treatment or care from a U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs or U.S. Department of Defense medical facility in the State; altering the duties of a nonprofit training entity selected under the Program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954535/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {954535/1 Adopted 19AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text - Chapter - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page