Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to decree an absolute divorce on the grounds of mutual consent if the parties have minor children, under certain circumstances; requiring a certain settlement agreement to provide for the care, custody, access, and support of minor or dependent children; requiring certain parties to attach a completed child support guidelines worksheet to a certain settlement agreement; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0358 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-33)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Favorable 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Referred Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (99-33) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page