Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that nonstock corporations and religious corporations must file only the seven most recently due annual reports when filing articles of revival and past-due annual reports online.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0853
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2021
Legislative Date
9/24/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2021 9/24/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Economic Matters 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text - Chapter - Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page