Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Delaying the effective date of the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act until July 1, 2018.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517171/1
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 (Finance Committee)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517171/1
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted (28-16)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted (28-15)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Enforcement - Delayed Implementation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Manno) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 (Finance Committee) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable Adopted (28-16) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted (28-15) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page