Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Augustine, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Ferguson, Griffith, Hayes, Hester, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Rosapepe, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain noncompete and conflict of interest provisions that restrict the ability of an employee to enter into employment with a new employer or to become self-employed in the same or similar business or trade are null and void as being against the public policy of the State; providing the Act does not apply to an employment contract or similar document or agreement with respect to the taking or use of a client list or other proprietary client-related information; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0038
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0468 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {213621/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933590/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {597977/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Floor Amendment {213621/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Economic Matters 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {933590/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page