Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations – Annual Reports – Fees for Electronic Filings
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Gallion, Hershey, Hester, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Eliminating filing fees paid by corporations and other business entities to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for certain annual reports due on or after April 15, 2023, that are filed electronically.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0409
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Corporations and Associations – Annual Reports – Fees for Electronic Filings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:55 PM
Click to return on the top page