Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators West and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising and clarifying laws relating to the formation, organization, and operation of corporations; repealing certain redundant and obsolete provisions; correcting certain references; authorizing a certain dissent to be submitted by electronic transmission; adding limited liability companies to the list of entity types that certain persons may serve in certain capacities and be eligible for insurance provided by certain other corporations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0999
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Favorable 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Smith) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Economic Matters 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Text - Chapter - Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page