Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Augustine, Carter, Hettleman, Kelley, Lee, Pinsky, Benson, Hayes, Hershey, and Jennings
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the method for calculating family income to be used to consider free or reduced-cost medical care under a certain hospital financial assistance policy; requiring that the description of a hospital's financial assistance policy include a section that allows a patient to initial that the patient has been made aware of the policy; prohibiting a hospital from charging interest or fees on certain debts incurred by certain patients; requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to develop certain guidelines; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0565
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447876/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable with Amendments {447876/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:41 PM
Click to return on the top page