Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible Internships
Sponsored by
Senators King, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Manno, Mathias, Peters, Rosapepe, and Smith
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing specified eligible employers a credit against the State income tax for employing specified interns, which may not exceed $1,000 for each eligible intern or 10% of the wages paid to each eligible intern, subject to specified limitations; requiring an eligible employer to enter into a specified agreement with an eligible higher education institution; providing that no more than $300,000 in tax credit certificates may be issued in any taxable year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1483
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0646 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible Internships
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {489839/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible Internships
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible Internships
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {489839/1 Adopted 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible Internships
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page