Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain individuals employed by federal agencies to comply with certain provisions of law; establishing that an applicant to obtain a certified social worker license is required to meet certain requirements by December 31, 2023; altering the number of hours of certain supervision an applicant for a certified social worker-clinical license is required to complete; requiring, as of calendar year 2023, a licensee seeking a license renewal to attest that the licensee has submitted to a criminal history records check; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684533/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {684533/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Returned Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:42 PM
Click to return on the top page