Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment and Investigation of Deaths Caused by Police Officers
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from receiving certain equipment from a program operated by the federal government for the transfer of surplus military equipment; requiring a law enforcement agency to notify the Independent Investigative Unit in the Office of the Attorney General of an alleged or potential police-involved death of a civilian by a certain time; establishing the Independent Investigative Unit in the Office of the Attorney General to investigate alleged or potential police-involved deaths of civilians; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {958077/1
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {958077/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {602810/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (41-93)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {603029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {723127/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (45-91)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {883126/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-91)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-93)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-39)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2021
Legislative Date
5/08/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General – Investigation and Prosecution of Deaths Caused by Police Officers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {958077/1 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Committee Amendment {958077/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Office of the State Prosecutor - Investigation and Prosecution of Deaths Caused by Police Officers
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judiciary 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 2:30 p.m.
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {602810/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (41-93) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Floor Committee Amendment {603029/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Floor Amendment {723127/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (45-91) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Floor Amendment {883126/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-91) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-93) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-39) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment and Investigation of Deaths Caused by Police Officers
Post Passage 5/08/2021 5/08/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
Text - Chapter - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment and Investigation of Deaths Caused by Police Officers
Last Updated: 5/12/2021 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page