Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Partnership Pilot Program – Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Innovation Initiative University Partnership Pilot Program within the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to expand opportunities for technology validation, entrepreneurial development, and industry engagement at eligible universities; requiring the Maryland Innovation Initiative within the Corporation to implement and administer the Pilot Program; authorizing Bowie State University and Frostburg State University to participate in the Pilot Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {357375/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations Ways and Means
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Partnership Pilot Program – Establishment
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {357375/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Partnership Pilot Program – Establishment
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Appropriations Ways and Means 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2021 3/28/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Text - Chapter - Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Partnership Pilot Program – Establishment
(   10-454, 10-455, 10-457, 10-461 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page