Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Sponsored by
Senators Lee and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "abuse" for the purpose of specified child abuse and neglect statutes to include the physical or mental injury of a child by a person who, because of the person's position or occupation, exercises authority over the child under specified circumstances; providing that "abuse" does not include the physical injury of a child by accidental means; altering the definition of "mental injury" for the purpose of specified child abuse and neglect statutes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1263
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
(   5-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page