Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Manno, Pinsky, Smith, Zucker, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain mental health or child care practitioners from engaging in conversion therapy with individuals who are minors; providing that a certain mental health or child care practitioner who engages in conversion therapy with a minor shall be considered to have engaged in unprofessional conduct subject to disciplinary action; defining "conversion therapy" as a practice or treatment by a mental health or child care practitioner that seeks to change an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0902
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664932/1
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664932/1
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664932/1
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {893529/2 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (13-33)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {453624/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {263124/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {353422/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (39-81)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {133826/2 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (37-88)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {353825/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (36-86)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-27)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {664932/1 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {664932/1 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {664932/1 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {893529/2 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (13-33) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {453624/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {263124/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Floor Amendment {353422/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (39-81) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Floor Amendment {133826/2 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (37-88) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Floor Amendment {353825/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (36-86) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (95-27) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page