Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2010 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 286

File Code: Education - Miscellaneous Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 466
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Currie and Conway
Entitled:
Governor's P-20 Leadership Council of Maryland

Synopsis:

Establishing the Governor's P-20 Leadership Council of Maryland, a partnership among the State, educators, and the business community to better prepare Maryland students for jobs of the 21st century while enhancing the State's economic competitiveness by creating a workforce with 21st-century skills; providing for the membership, tenure, chair, and staffing of the Council; establishing an Executive Committee; providing for the duties of the Executive Committee and Council; and requiring the Council to submit an annual report.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/22
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/3
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/5
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/9
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/8
First Reading Ways and Means & Appropriations
3/24
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/10
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-10)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 191

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Reports

Bill affects the following Statute:

Education
( 24-701 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 124937/01     Offered on: March 3, 2010   at: 11:15 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 425764/02     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 11:04 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
House
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 5, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 9, 2010: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
House
April 4, 2010: Third Reading Passed (127-10)
Click to return on the top page