Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2012 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 149

File Code: Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration Prior Year Introduction As: SB 708/11 - JPR Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 309
Sponsored By:
Delegates Beidle, Olszewski, Stein, Glenn, Lafferty, Niemann, and Kipke
Entitled:
Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Titling, Insurance, and Required Use of Protective Headgear

Synopsis:

Authorizing an insurer to exclude a moped and motor scooter from insurance benefits; requiring a moped or motor scooter in the State to be titled by the Motor Vehicle Administration; requiring an owner or prospective owner of a moped or motor scooter to obtain or maintain security; requiring an excise tax for a certificate of title for a specified moped or motor scooter; prohibiting an individual from operating or riding on a moped or motor scooter unless the individual is wearing specified headgear and eye protection; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
House Action
1/23
First Reading Environmental Matters
1/25
Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22

Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/19
Favorable with Amendments {930914/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/21
Third Reading Passed (98-33)
4/2
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (97-33)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/22
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30
Favorable with Amendments {238678/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/31
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-13)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/2
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 211

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pamela Beidle, District 32
Delegate Cheryl D. Glenn, District 45
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Stephen W. Lafferty, District 42
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate John A. Olszewski, Jr., District 6
Delegate Dana Stein, District 11

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Electronic Government
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Excise Tax
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates.
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Mopeds
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Registration
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Titles
Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death
Trials

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Insurance
( 19-505 , 20-501 )
Transportation
( 11-134.1 , 11-134.5 , 13-102 , 13-104 , 13-106 , 13-802 , 13-809 , 17-104.1 , 21-1207 , 21-1306.1 , 22-101 , 23-104 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 930914/01     Offered on: March 22, 2012   at: 8:06 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 238678/01     Offered on: April 5, 2012   at: 11:28 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Environmental Matters
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 21, 2012: Third Reading Passed (98-33)
April 2, 2012: Third Reading Passed (97-33)
Senate
March 31, 2012: Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Click to return on the top page