Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, McKay, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Landis, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning January 1, 2023, and subject to certain limitations, to provide dental services, including diagnostic, preventive, restorative, and periodontal services, for adults whose annual household income is at or below 133 percent of the federal poverty level; and repealing certain provisions of law requiring the implementation of a pilot program to provide limited dental coverage to adult recipients under the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0150
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-14)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
House 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743327/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (114-14) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Finance 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 12:05 PM
Click to return on the top page