Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners
Sponsored by
Delegates Johnson, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing registered nurse practitioners to prescribe and dispense auto-injectable epinephrine to certain certificate holders who operate youth camps.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0380
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m.
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {973725/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text - Chapter - Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners
Last Updated: 5/24/2022 4:40 PM
Click to return on the top page