Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required Record
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of junk or scrap metal to include cell tower batteries; and requiring a junk dealer or scrap metal processor to keep a specified accurate record of each purchase of a cell tower battery in the State.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required Record
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required Record
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Finance 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text - Chapter - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required Record
(   17-1001, 17-1011 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page