Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings
Sponsored by
Delegate Crutchfield
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a petitioner receiving medical treatment at a hospital to electronically file a petition for a temporary protective order while at the hospital; requiring hospitals to refer petitioners to certain programs; authorizing a petitioner to electronically file a petition for a temporary protective order from certain programs and centers; and requiring a court that receives an electronically filed petition to hold a hearing through video conferencing either the same or next business day under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0280
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873320/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Interim and Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings
House 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873320/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text - Chapter - Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings
(   4-505.1 )
Last Updated: 7/26/2022 11:37 AM
Click to return on the top page