Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch, Barkley, Brooks, Frick, Lisanti, and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the national family beer and wine exhibition permit to make it the national beer, wine, and liquor exhibition permit; authorizing the Comptroller to issue the permit to a bona fide alcohol trade association; authorizing the permit holder to exhibit, judge, and taste beer, wine, and liquor under specified circumstances; authorizing the permit holder to receive for use beer, wine, and liquor from specified persons under specified circumstances; providing a permit fee of $50; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page