Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Model Prisons Study Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegate Crutchfield
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Model Prisons Study Workgroup to develop a plan to bring about fundamental changes to the culture and practices of State prisons and to consult with certain social justice organizations as part of the process; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Workgroup to report and make recommendations the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Model Prisons Study Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Model Prisons Study Workgroup
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/2/2021 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page