Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Jones, Acevero, Addison, Allen, Alston, Atterbeary, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Barve, Boafo, Boyce, Bridges, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Clippinger, Crutchfield, Cullison, Ebersole, Embry, Fair, Feldmark, Foley, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, Harris, Harrison, Henson, Holmes, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaiser, Kaufman, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, J. Long, Lopez, Love, McCaskill, Mireku-North, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Phillips, Pruski, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Ruth, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Simmons, Simpson, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Taveras, Terrasa, Toles, Turner, Valderrama, Vogel, Watson, Wells, White, Wilkins, Williams, Wilson, and Ziegler
Status
Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 245
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that every person, as a central component of an individual's rights to liberty and equality, has the fundamental right to reproductive freedom; and prohibiting the State from, directly or indirectly, denying, burdening, or abridging the right unless justified by a compelling State interest achieved by the least restrictive means.
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0798
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1171 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2023
Legislative Date
2/15/2023
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {283723/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (35-96)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {373529/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (36-99)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {913523/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (38-97)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2023
Legislative Date
3/29/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2023
Legislative Date
3/19/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2023
Legislative Date
3/19/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {833328/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (17-30)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/03/2023
Legislative Date
5/03/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 245
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
House 2/15/2023 2/15/2023 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {283723/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (35-96) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {373529/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (36-99) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {913523/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (38-97) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
House 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Finance 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2023 3/29/2023 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2023 3/19/2023 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2023 3/19/2023 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2023 3/21/2023 Floor Amendment {833328/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (17-30) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2023 3/21/2023 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2023 3/21/2023 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/03/2023 5/03/2023 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 245
Text - Chapter - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
Last Updated: 5/9/2023 4:11 PM
Click to return on the top page