Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the definition of a health care facility, for the purpose of providing an exemption from the certificate of need requirement, does not include certain facilities that are for the exclusive use of the provider's subscribers who have executed continuing care at home agreements and paid certain entrance fees; and establishing an exception to certain application requirements for certain continuing care at home providers.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0804
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {153224/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {393029/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Finance 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Floor Amendment {153224/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Text - Chapter - Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page