Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Amprey, Anderson, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Attar, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Barve, Beitzel, Boteler, C. Branch, T. Branch, Bridges, Brooks, Buckel, Cardin, Carey, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Chisholm, Clark, Cox, Crosby, Crutchfield, Davis, Fennell, M. Fisher, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ghrist, Grammer, Griffith, Harrison, Hartman, Holmes, Hornberger, Howard, Howell, Ivey, Jackson, Jacobs, D. Jones, R. Jones, Kipke, Korman, Landis, Lehman, Lierman, Lisanti, Long, Lopez, Love, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Moon, Morgan, Novotny, Otto, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Queen, Reilly, Reznik, Rogers, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Szeliga, Toles, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Washington, Wilkins, Williams, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a half credit course in financial literacy; requiring each county board of education to implement the financial literacy curriculum content in every public high school in the county; and repealing a provision of law requiring the State Department of Education to report on certain changes to financial literacy curricula at a certain interval.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1299 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {423622/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page