Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Busch, Angel, B. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Frush, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, Valentino-Smith, West, K. Young, Cullison, Hayes, Krebs, Morales, Platt, and Saab
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purposes of the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund; providing that certain funds may be used only for the purposes of the State Reinsurance Program; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Exchange, in consultation with the Maryland Insurance Commission and as approved by the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Board, to establish and implement a State Reinsurance Program to provide reinsurance to certain carriers; requiring that the Program be designed to mitigate the impact of certain individuals on rates; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {906685/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {583825/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {906685/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Floor Amendment {583825/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program
(   31-107, 31-117, 31-117.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page