Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual under the age of 17 years from marrying; and authorizing a minor to file an action to divorce and deeming a minor emancipated for the limited purpose of obtaining a divorce.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0083
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0173 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/23/2021
Legislative Date
7/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303424/1
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {403321/1 (Senator Washington) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-21)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Carter and Hough)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Carter and Hough)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Bartlett and Shetty)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Bartlett and Shetty)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/23/2021 7/23/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {303424/1 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Washington) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Floor Amendment {403321/1 (Senator Washington) Rejected (16-28) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Senate 2/14/2022 2/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 23AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Referred Judiciary 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {913229/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (113-21) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Carter and Hough) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Carter and Hough) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Refuses Recede 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Bartlett and Shetty) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 House Refuses Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Bartlett and Shetty) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/4/2022 8:18 PM
Click to return on the top page