Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Business Relief Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified employee" to include certain individuals who are provided certain paid parental leave for purposes of a credit against the State income tax for certain small businesses that provide certain employer benefits to certain qualified employees; altering the calculation of the credit; providing that the total amount of credit certificates issued by the Department of Commerce in any taxable year may not exceed $5,000,000; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0046
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {189033/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Small Business Relief Tax Credit – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments {189033/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Small Business Relief Tax Credit – Alterations
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-748 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page