Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Forestry Education Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators King, Bailey, Benson, Carozza, Corderman, Elfreth, Gile, Guzzone, Hettleman, Jackson, Jennings, Klausmeier, Kramer, McCray, McKay, Rosapepe, Salling, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Forestry Education Fund to expand and enhance the Maryland Forestry Foundation's capacity to provide certain education and resources to forest landowners, the ability of district forestry boards and the knowledge of local governments to achieve healthy and sustainable forests, and the ability of businesses to test innovative best management practices in forestry; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill $250,000 for the Fund in fiscal years 2025 and 2026.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0289
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0876 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Forestry Education Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613426/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Forestry Education Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2023
Legislative Date
2/21/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
30BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2023
Legislative Date
2/23/2023
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Forestry Education Fund - Establishment
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments {613426/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Forestry Education Fund - Establishment
Senate 2/21/2023 2/21/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 30BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2023 2/23/2023 Referred Environment and Transportation 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/20/2023 1:16 PM
Click to return on the top page