Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees’ Retirement and Pension Systems – Reemployment Earnings Limitation – COVID–19 Exemption
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Gallion, Hershey, Hester, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting retirees of the Employees' Retirement and Pension Systems from a reemployment earnings limitation for up to 3 years when the individual was previously employed by the State of Maryland and is rehired by the Maryland Department of Health or the Maryland Department of Labor not later than December 31, 2022, to assist with the administration of federally funded grants or benefits related to the COVID-19 pandemic or to work as a member of the COVID Unified Command; and applying the Act retroactively to January 1, 2020.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0417
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Employees’ Retirement and Pension Systems – Reemployment Earnings Limitation – COVID–19 Exemption
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {333928/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Employees’ Retirement and Pension Systems – Reemployment Earnings Limitation – COVID–19 Exemption
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Appropriations 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text - Chapter - Employees’ Retirement and Pension Systems – Reemployment Earnings Limitation – COVID–19 Exemption
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:55 PM
Click to return on the top page