Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Augustine, Beidle, Brooks, Charles, Elfreth, Gile, Hettleman, Lam, McKay, and West
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Governor's Office for Children and the Special Secretary of the Governor's Office for Children as the head of the Office; requiring the Special Secretary to establish the ENOUGH grant program, subject to certain requirements; requiring the Office to assign certain staff for a certain purpose; establishing certain reporting and evaluation requirements; establishing the ENOUGH Grant Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Governor to appropriate $15,000,000 to the fund for fiscal year 2026; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0694
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-32)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Appropriations Health and Government Operations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {483024/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (106-32) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
(   9-2801 through 9-2805 )
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page