Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Rosapepe, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Middleton, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, and Young
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to award credit to a high school student who completes work-based training or classroom instruction under a registered apprenticeship program; authorizing a county board to count toward high school attendance the time certain apprentices spend during certain work-based training with certain employers; requiring the State Board of Education to report on progress, by high school and community college, toward the attainment of certain goals; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554734/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {185669/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Wilkins and Rose)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {554734/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {185669/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Recede 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Wilkins and Rose) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-123, 21-204, 7-205.4, 7-301.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page