Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, Kramer, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from denying an individual access to a home- and community-based services waiver due to a lack of funding for waiver services if the individual is living at home or in the community at a certain time, received certain services, will be or has been terminated from the Maryland Medical Assistance Program due to certain entitlement or enrollment, meets certain eligibility criteria, and certain services received by the individual would qualify for certain funds.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0832
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {787476/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page