Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program and Fund - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Augustine, Brooks, Feldman, Kagan, Simonaire, M. Washington, Watson, and Lewis Young
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program; requiring certain information about the Program to be provided to the parents of a child with a disability under certain circumstances; establishing the Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the Fund beginning in fiscal year 2026; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0903
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {143226/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113426/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {203320/1 (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-2)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Education - Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program and Fund - Established
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {823727/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Floor Amendment {143226/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program and Fund - Established
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {113426/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Floor Amendment {203320/1 (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-2) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program and Fund - Established
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page