Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class L beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for the county to issue the license to a holder of a manufacturer's license; authorizing the license holder to hold another license or permit issued by the Board; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell or provide samples of certain beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; requiring the license holder to provide prepackaged snacks; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2022 3/20/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page