Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Congressional Districting Plan
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission)
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 12/9/2021) - Chapter 32
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the composition of the eight districts in the State of Maryland for the election of members to the United States House of Representatives; requiring that a certain question be submitted to the qualified voters of the State if the Act is petitioned to referendum under Article XVI of the Maryland Consitution; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/02/2021
Legislative Date
12/02/2021
Action
Hearing 12/06 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Congressional Districting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (98-37)
Proceedings
1AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
1AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 12/7 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
1AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/07/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {583029/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (43-93)
Proceedings
1BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/07/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
1BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Congressional Districting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/07/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-42)
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/07/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
1DClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/07/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Hearing 12/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {723420/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (15-32)
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
2AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
12/09/2021
Legislative Date
12/09/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/09/2021
Legislative Date
12/09/2021
Action
Overridden (96-42)
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/09/2021
Legislative Date
12/09/2021
Action
Overridden (32-14)
Proceedings
4 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
12/09/2021
Legislative Date
12/09/2021
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 12/9/2021) - Chapter 32
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Congressional Districting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 12/02/2021 12/02/2021 Hearing 12/06 at 12:30 p.m.
Text - First - Congressional Districting Plan
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (98-37) 1AClick to view Recorded Media
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Favorable Adopted 1AClick to view Recorded Media
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Motion Special Order until 12/7 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 1AClick to view Recorded Media
House 12/07/2021 12/06/2021 Floor Amendment {583029/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (43-93) 1BClick to view Recorded Media
House 12/07/2021 12/06/2021 Second Reading Passed 1BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Congressional Districting Plan
House 12/07/2021 12/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-42) 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/07/2021 12/06/2021 Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting 1DClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/07/2021 12/07/2021 Hearing 12/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Reapportionment and Redistricting Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/08/2021 12/08/2021 Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Senate 12/08/2021 12/07/2021 Favorable Adopted 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/08/2021 12/07/2021 Floor Amendment {723420/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (15-32) 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/08/2021 12/07/2021 Second Reading Passed 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/08/2021 12/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 3 Click to view Recorded Media
House 12/08/2021 12/07/2021 Returned Passed 2AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 12/09/2021 12/09/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 12/09/2021 12/09/2021 Overridden (96-42) 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/09/2021 12/09/2021 Overridden (32-14) 4 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 12/09/2021 12/09/2021 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 12/9/2021) - Chapter 32
Text - Chapter - Congressional Districting Plan
(   8-701, 8-702 through 8-709 )
Last Updated: 12/14/2021 10:47 AM
Click to return on the top page