Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Waldstreicher, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a life insurer to refuse an application for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor only under certain circumstances; requiring an application for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor to include a certain consent and the signatures of the applicant and, the parent or legal guardian with whom the minor resides, if the minor is neither emancipated or married; requiring a life insurer to take certain actions as part of the insurer's written standards and procedures for policy application and acceptance; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0168
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/19/2017
Legislative Date
7/19/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {356180/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/19/2017 7/19/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {356180/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Finance 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Text - Chapter - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
(   16-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page