Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger and Reilly
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the medical services provided by an emergency service transporter for which the Maryland Department of Health is required to reimburse the emergency service transporter who charges for its services and requests reimbursement from the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; and requiring the Department to increase the amount of reimbursement by $25 each fiscal year, beginning in fiscal 2023, until the rate is at $300.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0295
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0552 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2021
Legislative Date
10/25/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2021 10/25/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page