Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Hornberger, Atterbeary, Barron, Charkoudian, Kittleman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Sydnor, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the penalty for certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling; making certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling a civil offense; establishing that adjudication of a violation under a certain provision of the Act is not a criminal conviction for any purpose and does not impose any of the civil disabilities that may result from a criminal conviction; altering certain penalties; authorizing a certain police officer to issue a certain citation under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0842
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {935961/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {258472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {935961/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {258472/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
(   12-102, 12-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page