Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr and Johnson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education and authorizing a nonpublic school, beginning in the 2023-2024 school year, to require at least two school personnel at the school to be trained in certain seizure recognition and response methods; requiring a public school, beginning in the 2023-2024 school year, to provide training every 2 years to school personnel with direct contact and supervision of students on certain seizure recognition and response methods; providing immunity from civil liability under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0299
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-450 )
Last Updated: 1/24/2022 9:50 AM
Click to return on the top page