Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial to study establishing a memorial dedicated to Maryland women veterans; and requiring the Commission to submit a preliminary report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by February 1, 2023 and a final report by September 30, 2023.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2021
Legislative Date
10/08/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2021 10/08/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2022 3:54 PM
Click to return on the top page