Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Determination of Taxable Income – Union Dues and Expenses to Influence Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an addition modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses to assist, promote, or deter collective bargaining; and allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain union dues paid during the taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/07/2021
Legislative Date
7/07/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/07/2021 7/07/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax – Determination of Taxable Income – Union Dues and Expenses to Influence Collective Bargaining
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page