Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues
Sponsored by
Delegates Chang and Krimm
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "cottage food business" for the purpose of increasing from $25,000 to $100,000 the cap on the annual revenue from the sale of cottage food products that a cottage food business may earn.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0889 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 3:54 PM
Click to return on the top page