Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties and State Legislative Districts - Food Environment Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Departments of Housing and Community Development, Planning, Human Services, and Agriculture to jointly produce a report to the General Assembly for each county and State legislative district on the food environment in the county and district on or before July 1, 2022, and every 2 years thereafter; requiring the reports to include metrics that determine food insecurity zones; authorizing the departments to collaborate with certain universities, nonprofit organizations and local planning and zoning departments; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1325 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Counties and State Legislative Districts - Food Environment Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Counties and State Legislative Districts - Food Environment Reports
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/12/2022 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page