Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Lehman, Charkoudian, Healey, Kaufman, Pena-Melnyk, Solomon, Spiegel, Wims, Guyton, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program to authorize the use of noise abatement monitoring systems in Anne Arundel County, Montgomery County, and Prince George's County to enforce certain motor vehicle noise requirements; requiring a county, before activating a noise abatement monitoring system, to publish notice of the locations of the systems on its website and ensure that the systems are near a sign that indicates that the systems are in use and is in accordance with certain specifications; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0155
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2023
Legislative Date
10/25/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Korman) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {563925/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (42-97)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-39)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-35)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2023 10/25/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Authorization
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {533928/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Korman) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Floor Amendment {563925/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (42-97) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Pilot Program
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (94-39) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {923221/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (95-35) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Pilot Program
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:48 AM
Click to return on the top page