Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population Protection
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, Glass, Glenn, Hayes, Kelly, Lam, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Robinson, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a provider of water or sewerage system service to temporarily shut off service for reasons of health or safety or in a State or national emergency; requiring a provider to mail a specified notice when temporarily shutting off service; prohibiting a provider from shutting off service unless the provider provides specified notices at the premises within specified time periods; prohibiting a provider from shutting off service for specified reasons; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0546
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population Protection
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   9-2A-01 through 9-2A-05, 9-658, 9-662, 9-663, 9-724, 9-939, 9-951 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page