Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Sale or Distribution of Trichloroethylene - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Cain, Ebersole, Krimm, R. Lewis, Shetty, Smith, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2021, a person from selling or distributing in commerce an aerosol degreaser or a spot cleaner for dry cleaning that contains trichloroethylene; and establishing that a person that violates the provision or any regulation adopted by the Secretary of Health to carry out the provision is guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to a fine not to exceed $1,000 for each violation.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Sale or Distribution of Trichloroethylene - Prohibition
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page