Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
Sponsored by
Delegates Elliott, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Frank, Frush, Glass, McComas, McDermott, Norman, Schulz, Serafini, Simmons, Stocksdale, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a single registration plate to all classes of vehicles; providing for the method of attachment of the registration plate; and requiring the publisher of the Annotated Code to make specified corrections.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0513 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
(   13-410, 13-411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page